HLS 15RS-681 REENGROSSED 2015 Regular Session HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 5 BY REPRESENTATIVE ST. GERMAIN NATURAL RESOURCES DEPT: Approves the 2015-2016 Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan 1 A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION 2To approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2015-2016, as adopted by 3 the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and 4 Restoration Authority. 5 WHEREAS, R.S. 30:2000.1 et seq., provides for the creation, duties, and 6responsibilities of the Atchafalaya Basin Program, in the office of the secretary of the 7Department of Natural Resources, and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion 8Board; and 9 WHEREAS, pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11, a technical advisory group has been 10appointed to review, evaluate, and approve all water management and water quality projects 11proposed for inclusion in an annual plan to determine if the project meets the criteria for 12inclusion in the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan, and make recommendations to the 13Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board; and 14 WHEREAS, public participation in the development of the Atchafalaya Basin 15Annual Plan is essential to the success of the Atchafalaya Basin Program; and 16 WHEREAS, nominations for water quality projects were accepted from July 1, 2013, 17through June 30, 2014, at which time the technical advisory group reviewed and evaluated 18the water quality projects that were nominated by the public and selected projects for 19inclusion in the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(B); and 20 WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan was then presented for public 21comment and discussion at meetings that were held on November 5, 2014, in Plaquemine, Page 1 of 3 HLS 15RS-681 REENGROSSED HCR NO. 5 1Louisiana, on November 6, 2014, in Henderson, Louisiana, and on November 13, 2014, in 2Morgan City, Louisiana; and 3 WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board at a public 4meeting held on December 2, 2014, in Baton Rouge, Louisiana, after receiving and 5considering the comments of the public, and the recommendations of the Atchafalaya Basin 6Program staff, unanimously approved the draft Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan; and 7 WHEREAS, the draft Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan was submitted on December 83, 2014, to the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority (CPRA) pursuant to R.S. 930:2000.11(E) for their review and approval as consistent with the master plan for coastal 10protection and restoration for a sustainable coast and was unanimously approved by the 11CPRA at its February 11, 2015, meeting; and 12 WHEREAS, at a public meeting held on January 13, 2015, the Atchafalaya Basin 13Research and Promotion Board, as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(D), considered and 14unanimously approved the proposed Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan in its final version; and 15 WHEREAS, both the CPRA and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion 16Board must approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan prior to submission of the plan to 17the legislature, and the legislature may approve or disapprove the Atchafalaya Basin Annual 18Plan by resolution adopted by a majority vote of the members of each house of the 19legislature; and 20 WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan shall not be effective or 21implemented unless both houses of the legislature approve the annual plan or fail to 22disapprove the annual plan; and 23 WHEREAS, the secretary shall implement the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan if the 24legislature approves the plan or if the legislature fails to timely disapprove of the plan. 25 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby 26approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2015-2016, as presented by the 27secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and adopted by the Atchafalaya Basin 28Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority. Page 2 of 3 HLS 15RS-681 REENGROSSED HCR NO. 5 1 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the 2secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and 3Promotion Board. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HCR 5 Reengrossed 2015 Regular Session St. Germain Approves the 2015-2016 Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan. Page 3 of 3