House | 05/01/2015 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |