LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2015 Regular Session
House
Bills
HCR77
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HCR77
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HCR77
Action History
House
05/26/2015
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 50. Failed to pass.
House
05/21/2015
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/26/2015.
House
05/14/2015
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
House
05/13/2015
Reported with amendments (9-0).
House
04/28/2015
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
House
04/27/2015
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.