House
|
06/03/2015
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|