House | 06/10/2015 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 06/09/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2015. | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Reported with amendments (7-0). | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |