House | 05/18/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 9 nays; ordered re-reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |