Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 450.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 5 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 6. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/08/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2015
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 4 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|