Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2015
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/02/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|