Senate | 05/21/2015 | Returned to the Senate and approved. | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Approved on 5/20/2015. | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Study request list distributed to members on 5/18/2015. | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Received on 5/11/2015. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Study request list distributed to the members on 5/4/2015. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Request study by the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Received by the Senate Office on 4/30/2015. |