LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2015 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SSR1
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SSR1
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SSR1
Action History
Senate
06/05/2015
Approved on 6/5/2015.
Senate
06/02/2015
Study request list distributed to the members on 6/2/2015.
Senate
06/01/2015
Request study by the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Senate
06/01/2015
Received by the Senate Office on 6/1/2015.