House
|
03/16/2016
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 28.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 3/14/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 22 yeas and 15 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 74, nays 26. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, LaFleur, and Martiny.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
House conferees appointed: Jackson, Abramson, and Barras.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 8, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/09/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 12 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2016
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2016
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 55, nays 46. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2016
|
Motion to reconsider called from the table.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 38, nays 61. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/26/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/25/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Reported unfavorably (19-0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2016
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|