Louisiana 2016 1st Special Session

Louisiana House Bill HB22 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version

                            ENROLLED
ACT No. 28
2016 First Extraordinary Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 22
BY REPRESENTATIVE JACKSON
1	AN ACT
2 To amend and reenact R.S. 51:2455(D)(3) and Section 6 of Act No. 126 of the 2015 Regular
3 Session and to enact Section 7 of Act No. 126 of the 2015 Regular Session, relative
4 to Act No. 126 of the 2015 Regular Session of the Legislature; to change the
5 application filing period for certain tax rebates; to extend the sunset of reductions
6 made in Act No. 126 of the 2015 Regular Session; to provide for an effective date;
7 and to provide for related matters.
8 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
9 Section 1. R.S. 51:2455(D)(3) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows:
10 ยง2455. Incentive rebates
11	*          *          *
12	D.(1)
13	*          *          *
14	(3) Applications shall be filed no later than twenty-four months after the
15 filing of the advance notification, except for advances filed on or after July 1, 2011
16 January 1, 2014, and before July 1, 2012 January 31, 2014, applications may be filed
17 at any time prior to August 15, 2015 January 31, 2016.
18	*          *          *
19 Section 2.  Section 6 of Act No. 126 of the 2015 Regular Session is hereby amended
20 and reenacted and Section 7 of Act No. 126 of the 2015 Regular Session is hereby enacted
21 to read as follows:
22	*          *          *
Page 1 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HB NO. 22	ENROLLED
1	Section 6.  The provisions of Section 2 of this Act shall become effective on
2 July 1, 2015, and shall remain effective through June 30, 2018.  The provisions of
3 Sections 3 of this Act shall become effective on July 1, 2018. In the event the Act
4 that originated as House Bill No. 62 of the 2016 First Extraordinary Session of the
5 Legislature is enacted and becomes effective, the provisions of Section 2 of this Act
6 shall remain in effect through the sunset date in the Act that originated as House Bill
7 No. 62 of the 2016 First Extraordinary Session of the Legislature.
8	Section 7.  In the event the Act that originated as House Bill No. 62 of the
9 2016 First Extraordinary Session of the Legislature is enacted and becomes effective,
10 the provisions of Sections 1, 2, and 3 of this Act shall remain in effect through the
11 termination date in the Act that originated as House Bill No. 62 of the 2016 First
12 Extraordinary Session of the Legislature.
13	*          *          *
14 Section 3.  This Act shall take effect only if and when the Act that originated as
15 House Bill No. 62 of this 2016 First Extraordinary Session of the Legislature becomes
16 effective.
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF LOUISIANA
APPROVED:  
Page 2 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.