Senate | 03/02/2016 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 02/25/2016 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 02/17/2016 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 02/17/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2016 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2016 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |