House | 06/15/2016 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 06/15/2016 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 06/13/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/15/2016. | ||
House | 06/13/2016 | Notice given. | ||
House | 06/09/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/13/2016. | ||
House | 06/08/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/09/2016. | ||
House | 06/08/2016 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/08/2016 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 06/08/2016 | Reported with amendments (13-0). | ||
House | 06/06/2016 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 06/05/2016 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 06/05/2016 | Prefiled. |