Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 19. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2016
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
Reported without amendments (9-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2016
|
Reported favorably (8-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|