House | 04/14/2016 | Notice removed | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/14/2016. | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/07/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/12/2016. | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | Reported with amendments (12-1-2). | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. | ||
House | 03/02/2016 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/02/2016 | Prefiled. |