Senate | 05/02/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/27/2016 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016. | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/20/2016 | Reported with amendments (9-0). | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Prefiled. |