House | 04/27/2016 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 37, nays 60. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016. | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/20/2016 | Reported with amendments (8-0). | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Prefiled. |