Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/12/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|