House | 05/11/2016 | Becomes HB 1165. | ||
House | 05/10/2016 | Reported by substitute (9-0). | ||
House | 04/26/2016 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 04/25/2016 | Reported with amendments (15-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Prefiled. |