LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2016 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB943
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB943
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2016 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB943
Action History
House
05/03/2016
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
House
04/28/2016
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2016.
House
04/27/2016
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
House
04/26/2016
Reported with amendments (16-0).
House
03/31/2016
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
House
03/30/2016
Read by title.