LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2016 Regular Session
House
Bills
HCR119
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HCR119
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2016 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HCR119
Action History
House
05/23/2016
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
House
05/19/2016
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2016.
House
05/17/2016
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
House
05/16/2016
Reported favorably (11-0).
House
05/10/2016
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
House
05/09/2016
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.