House | 05/20/2016 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2016 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/17/2016 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/16/2016 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 84, nays 2, Senate amendments concurred in. | ||
House | 05/13/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2016. | ||
House | 05/12/2016 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 3 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2016 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/25/2016 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |