House | 05/10/2016 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | ||
House | 04/19/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 04/18/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |