Senate | 05/16/2016 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2016. | ||
House | 05/11/2016 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2016 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/10/2016 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 86 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 05/05/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2016. | ||
House | 05/05/2016 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | Reported favorably (13-0). | ||
House | 04/07/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |