Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR2 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

                            2016 Regular Session	ENROLLED
SENATE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 2
BY SENATOR WARD 
A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION
To approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2016-2017, as adopted by
the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and
Restoration Authority.
WHEREAS, R.S. 30:2000.1 et seq., provides for the creation, duties, and
responsibilities of the Atchafalaya Basin Program, in the office of the secretary of the
Department of Natural Resources, and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion
Board; and 
WHEREAS, pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11, a technical advisory group has been
appointed to review, evaluate, and approve all water management and water quality projects
proposed for inclusion in an annual plan to determine if the project meets the criteria for
inclusion in the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan, and make recommendations to the
Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board; and 
WHEREAS, public participation in the development of the Atchafalaya Basin
Annual Plan is essential to the success of the Atchafalaya Basin Program; and 
WHEREAS, nominations for water quality projects were accepted from July 1, 2014,
through June 30, 2015, at which time the technical advisory group reviewed and evaluated
the water quality projects that were nominated by the public and selected projects for
inclusion in the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(B); and 
WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan was then presented for public
comment and discussion at meetings that were held on October 6, 2015, in Henderson,
Louisiana; on October 7, 2015, in Plaquemine, Louisiana; and on October 8, 2015, in
Morgan City, Louisiana; and 
WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board at a public
meeting held on November 5, 2015, in Baton Rouge, Louisiana, after receiving and
considering the comments of the public, and the recommendations of the Atchafalaya Basin
Program staff, unanimously approved the draft Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan; and 
Page 1 of 2 SCR NO. 2	ENROLLED
WHEREAS, the draft Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan was submitted on
December 16, 2015, to the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority (CPRA) pursuant
to R.S. 30:2000.11(E) for their review and approval as consistent with the master plan for
coastal protection and restoration for a sustainable coast and was unanimously approved by
CPRA at its January 13, 2016, meeting; and 
WHEREAS, at a public meeting held on February 2, 2016, the Atchafalaya Basin
Research and Promotion Board, as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(D), considered and
unanimously approved the proposed Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan in its final version; and 
WHEREAS, such committees must take action on the Atchafalaya Basin Annual
Plan, and the legislature may approve or disapprove the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan by
resolution adopted by a majority vote of the members of each house of the legislature; and 
WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan shall not be effective or
implemented unless both houses of the legislature approve the annual plan or fail to
disapprove the annual plan; and 
WHEREAS, the secretary shall implement the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan if the
legislature approves the plan or if the legislature fails to timely disapprove of the plan.
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby
approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2016-2017, as presented by the
secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and adopted by the Atchafalaya Basin
Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the
secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and
Promotion Board.
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Page 2 of 2