Louisiana 2016 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR2 Introduced / Bill

                    SLS 16RS-158	ORIGINAL
2016 Regular Session
SENATE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 2
BY SENATOR WARD 
NATURAL RESOURCES DEPT.  Approves the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal
Year 2016-2017.
1	A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION
2 To approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2016-2017, as adopted by
3 the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and
4 Restoration Authority.
5 WHEREAS, R.S. 30:2000.1 et seq., provides for the creation, duties, and
6 responsibilities of the Atchafalaya Basin Program, in the office of the secretary of the
7 Department of Natural Resources, and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion
8 Board; and 
9 WHEREAS, pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11, a technical advisory group has been
10 appointed to review, evaluate, and approve all water management and water quality projects
11 proposed for inclusion in an annual plan to determine if the project meets the criteria for
12 inclusion in the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan, and make recommendations to the
13 Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board; and 
14 WHEREAS, public participation in the development of the Atchafalaya Basin
15 Annual Plan is essential to the success of the Atchafalaya Basin Program; and 
16 WHEREAS, nominations for water quality projects were accepted from July 1, 2014,
17 through June 30, 2015, at which time the technical advisory group reviewed and evaluated
18 the water quality projects that were nominated by the public and selected projects for
Page 1 of 3 SCR NO. 2
SLS 16RS-158	ORIGINAL
1 inclusion in the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(B); and 
2 WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan was then presented for public
3 comment and discussion at meetings that were held on October 6, 2015, in Henderson,
4 Louisiana; on October 7, 2015, in Plaquemine, Louisiana; and on October 8, 2015, in
5 Morgan City, Louisiana; and 
6 WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board at a public
7 meeting held on November 5, 2015, in Baton Rouge, Louisiana, after receiving and
8 considering the comments of the public, and the recommendations of the Atchafalaya Basin
9 Program staff, unanimously approved the draft Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan; and 
10 WHEREAS, the draft Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan was submitted on December
11 16, 2015, to the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority (CPRA) pursuant to R.S.
12 30:2000.11(E) for their review and approval as consistent with the master plan for coastal
13 protection and restoration for a sustainable coast and was unanimously approved by CPRA
14 at its January 13, 2016, meeting; and 
15 WHEREAS, at a public meeting held on February 2, 2016, the Atchafalaya Basin
16 Research and Promotion Board, as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(D), considered and
17 unanimously approved the proposed Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan in its final version; and 
18 WHEREAS, such committees must take action on the Atchafalaya Basin Annual
19 Plan, and the legislature may approve or disapprove the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan by
20 resolution adopted by a majority vote of the members of each house of the legislature; and 
21 WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan shall not be effective or
22 implemented unless both houses of the legislature approve the annual plan or fail to
23 disapprove the annual plan; and 
24 WHEREAS, the secretary shall implement the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan if the
25 legislature approves the plan or if the legislature fails to timely disapprove of the plan.
26 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby
27 approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2016-2017, as presented by the
28 secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and adopted by the Atchafalaya Basin
29 Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority.
30 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the
Page 2 of 3 SCR NO. 2
SLS 16RS-158	ORIGINAL
1 secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and
2 Promotion Board.
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Alan Miller.
DIGEST
SCR 2 Original 2016 Regular Session	Ward
Approves the 2016-2017 Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan.
Page 3 of 3