Senate | 05/30/2016 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016. | ||
House | 05/25/2016 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2016 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/24/2016 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 88 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 05/19/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2016. | ||
House | 05/13/2016 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/12/2016 | Reported favorably (11-0). | ||
House | 05/05/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |