House
|
03/03/2017
|
Effective date: March 3, 2017.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2017
|
Signed by the Governor with one or more line-item vetoes. Becomes Act No. 1.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 2/23/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 4. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/22/17.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: LaFleur, Alario, and Tarver.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
House conferees appointed: Henry, Smith, and Barras.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 1, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2017
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/20/17.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2017
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2017
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2017
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2017
|
Reported without action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 57, nays 39. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2017
|
Read by title, rules suspended, action deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/17/17.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2017
|
Reported with amendments (19-4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|