House | 05/01/2017 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 31, nays 56. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/17. | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Reported with amendments (17-0). | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Prefiled. |