Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported with amendments (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|