Senate | 05/08/2017 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 36. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/17. | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Reported favorably (9-4). | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 02/03/2017 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/3/2017. | ||
House | 01/25/2017 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 01/25/2017 | Prefiled. |