House | 05/17/2017 | Notice removed | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/17. | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/17. | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Reported favorably (19-0). | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |