House | 05/25/2017 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 21, nays 61. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17. | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Reported with amendments (7-6-1). | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/17/2017 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/17/2017. | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Prefiled. |