House
|
06/05/2017
|
Notice removed
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2017
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|