Senate | 06/08/2017 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/9/2017. | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2017 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 93 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 06/05/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/17. | ||
House | 06/04/2017 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/02/2017 | Reported favorably (9-0). | ||
House | 05/31/2017 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 05/31/2017 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2017 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2017 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |