Senate | 05/24/2017 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |