Senate | 03/02/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2018 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 02/28/2018 | Read third time by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 71, nays 34. The resolution, having the required two-thirds vote of the elected members, was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 02/20/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/28/18. | ||
House | 02/20/2018 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 02/20/2018 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 02/20/2018 | Reported favorably (19-0). | ||
House | 02/19/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 02/16/2018 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 02/16/2018 | Prefiled. |