House
|
06/12/2018
|
Effective date: 7/1/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 9.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2018
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/6/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 102, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: LaFleur, Donahue, and Bishop.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
House conferees appointed: Henry, Foil, and Jackson.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 102, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/04/18.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2018
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2018
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2018
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2018
|
Reported favorably (22-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|