House | 03/27/2018 | Withdrawn from the files of the House. | ||
House | 03/27/2018 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 03/26/2018 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/22/2018 | Reported favorably (9-0). | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/01/2018 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/01/2018 | Prefiled. |