Senate | 04/04/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/03/2018 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/29/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/18. | ||
House | 03/27/2018 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/26/2018 | Reported favorably (12-0). | ||
House | 03/12/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Prefiled. |