Senate | 05/08/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/03/2018 | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 85, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/27/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/18. | ||
House | 04/26/2018 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/25/2018 | Reported with amendments (9-0). | ||
House | 04/16/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 04/13/2018 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |