House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 25 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 80, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Discharged from the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2018
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|