House
|
05/08/2018
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2018
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2018
|
Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2018
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2018
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|