Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Effective date 5/23/2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 523.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 25 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 6. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2018
|
Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2018
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2018
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2018
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|