Senate
|
05/20/2018
|
Effective date 10/1/2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 367.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 28 yeas and 6 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2018
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2018
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2018
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2018
|
Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 5 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2018
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|