Senate
|
06/01/2018
|
Effective date 6/1/2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 660.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 58, nays 27. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Notice House rejected the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 52, nays 30. The Conference Committee Report was rejected.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 21 yeas and 9 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Notice of change in House Conference Committee membership.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Notice of change in House conferees: Leger,Nancy Landry, Edmonds.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
House conferees appointed: Leger, Hoffmann, and Edmonds.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Claitor, Morrish, and Donahue.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2018
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2018
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Reported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
The bill, as previously amended, was read by title, passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 10 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2018
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2018
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|