House
|
05/09/2018
|
Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2018
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2018
|
Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 10 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2018
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2018
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2018
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|