Senate | 05/16/2019 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19. | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Prefiled. |