House | 05/14/2019 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 40, nays 42. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19. | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Reported favorably (11-2). | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Prefiled. |